MD SB700 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-4)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-4)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the Governor's Office of Minority Affairs to be the Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs; renaming the Special Secretary for the Office of Minority Affairs to be the Special Secretary for the Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs; renaming the Interdepartmental Advisory Committee on Minority Affairs to be the Interdepartmental Advisory Committee on Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs; etc.
Title
State Government - Office of Minority Affairs and Interdepartmental Advisory Committee on Minority Affairs - Renaming
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-15 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Floor Amendment {723522/1 (Senator Oaks) Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Annotated Code of Maryland
Committees and Commissions
Minorities
Names
Small Business
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Women
Committees and Commissions
Minorities
Names
Small Business
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Women