MD SB70 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB822
Note: Carry Over of previous SB137
Note: Carry Over of previous SB137
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-06 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-06 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for the first $5,000 of income earned by certain law enforcement officers to include State law enforcement officers who reside in a political subdivision in which the crime rate exceeds the State's crime rate; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2022.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - State Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-09 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {293120/1 Adopted |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2022-11-18 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB70 (Carry Over) 2023-03-06 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
SB137 (Carry Over) 2022-03-29 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
SB137 (Carry Over) 2022-03-29 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |