MD SB70 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB86
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing, from 120 to 240, the minimum number of calendar days that the Correctional Education Council must require certain inmates in correctional institutions to participate in a certain mandatory education program.
Title
Correctional Institutions - Correctional Education Council - Mandatory Education Program Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | House | Hearing canceled (Judiciary) |
2020-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 5:00 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing canceled (Judiciary) |
2020-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2020-02-10 | House | Referred Judiciary Ways and Means |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB70 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Subjects
Correctional Institutions
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Job Training
Prisoners
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Time
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Job Training
Prisoners
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 11 | 902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |