MD SB70 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the articles of organization for a limited liability company to include the name and address of each member of the limited liability company; providing that if the State Department of Assessments and Taxation issues a certain proclamation declaring that a limited liability company has forfeited certain rights, the members of the limited liability company become the trustees of its assets for certain purposes; etc.
Title
Corporations – Limited Liability Companies – Member–Trustees – Establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-10-02 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Business Trusts
Contracts
Corporations
Corporations and Associations
Limited Liability Companies
Business Trusts
Contracts
Corporations
Corporations and Associations
Limited Liability Companies