MD SB70 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that, under specified circumstances, work that is performed by qualifying youth sports workers for youth sports organizations is not covered employment under the unemployment insurance law.
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Youth Sports Workers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-01 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {787670/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Exemptions
Federal Government
Insurance
Sports and Recreation
Unemployment
Unemployment Insurance
Volunteers
Work, Labor and Employment
Youth
Federal Government
Insurance
Sports and Recreation
Unemployment
Unemployment Insurance
Volunteers
Work, Labor and Employment
Youth