MD SB70 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing specified methods by which the juvenile court, in specified permanency planning and guardianship review hearings, may satisfy the requirement that the court consult on the record with the child under specified circumstances; and specifying that the purpose of the consultation is to obtain the child's views on permanency.
Title
Family Law - Permanency Planning and Guardianship Review Hearings - Court
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (127-11) | |
2012-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2012-03-14 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-23 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-02-22 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-02-20 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-20 | Favorable with Amendments 478575/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-01-24 | Hearing 2/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-16 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Adoption
Courts
Foster Care
Guardians
Hearings
Juvenile Causes
Local Government Mandates
Minors
Notices
Video
Courts
Foster Care
Guardians
Hearings
Juvenile Causes
Local Government Mandates
Minors
Notices
Video