MD SB699 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a law enforcement agency from using captured plate data unless the agency has a legitimate law enforcement purpose; establishing that information gathered by an automatic license plate reader system is not subject to disclosure under the Maryland Public Information Act; requiring the Department of State Police, in conjunction with the Maryland Coordination and Analysis Center and specified law enforcement agencies, to report annually specified information to the General Assembly beginning in 2016; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Automatic License Plate Readers and Captured Plate Data - Authorized Uses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-14SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 192
2014-04-07SenatePassed Enrolled
2014-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2014-04-07SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2014-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
2014-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {232118/1 Report Adopted
2014-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2014-04-04HouseHearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-04-03HouseRereferred to Judiciary
2014-03-26HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2014-03-26SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2014-03-25SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-03-25SenateFavorable with Amendments {188779/2 Report Adopted
2014-03-25SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2014-03-06SenateHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-01-31SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0699&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2014rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/sb/sb0699f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/sb/sb0699t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/sb/sb0699e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/Chapters_noln/CH_192_sb0699e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0699_18877902.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0699_23211801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/fnotes/bil_0009/sb0699.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/sb0699_jpr.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/sb0699_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0699,s-0717&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0699,s-1212&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0699,h-1279&stab=02&ys=2014RS

Bill Comments

feedback