MD SB697 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that a child conceived by means of assisted reproduction during the marriage of the child's mother with the consent of the mother's spouse is the legitimate child of both spouses for all purposes; providing that a child conceived by means of assisted reproduction after the death of the mother's spouse and using the genetic material of the mother's spouse is the legitimate child of both spouses under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family Law - Parentage and Adoption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (34-10) (Y: 34 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (121-15) (Y: 121 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-13) (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 437
2019-04-05SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (34-10)
2019-04-05SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (121-15)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments {352218/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-03-19HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (33-13)
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {828074/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0697&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0697f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0697t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0697e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_437_sb0697e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0697_82807401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0697_35221801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0007/sb0697.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0697_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0673.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0697_hgo.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0697_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1196.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1247.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback