MD SB696 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Frederick County to issue an art gallery beer and wine license to nonprofit and for-profit retail businesses that display and sell original artwork, or copies of original artwork that are produced no more than 300 times, by an individual or a group of artists; specifying that a holder of the license may sell or serve beer and wine at retail for on-premises consumption when snacks are served during specified hours; specifying a $100 annual license fee; etc.
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Art Gallery Beer and Wine License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) |
2016-04-11 | House | Special Order until next session (Delegate Barkley) Adopted |
2016-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {743794/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-11 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Waugh) {463225/1 Adopted |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {894933/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Fees
Food
Frederick County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Nonprofit Organizations
Retail Sales
St. Mary's County
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Fees
Food
Frederick County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Nonprofit Organizations
Retail Sales
St. Mary's County
Time