MD SB694 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "executive order" to remove from the definition an order or an amendment or a rescission of an order that adopts specified guidelines, rules of conduct, or rules of procedure for specified persons.
Title
State Government - Executive Order - Definition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-27 | Hearing 3/7 at 1:20 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-16 | Hearing 3/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-16 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/SB0694.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/sb/sb0694f.pdf |