MD SB693 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to submit an annual report on assaults on public transit operators to certain persons; and requiring the report to include information for the immediately preceding 12 months on the nature of each assault, the mode of transit involved, the location of each assault, whether the police were involved in responding to each assault, and the outcome of any investigation, a comparison of the aggregate data with at least two other states, and a review of current transit industry best practices.
Title
Transportation - Assaults on Public Transit Operators - Report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2023-04-03 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-03-16 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Floor Amendment {703923/1 (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {303225/1 Adopted |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB1049 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 502
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Data
Mass Transit
Reports
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Violence
Work, Labor, and Employment
Data
Mass Transit
Reports
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Violence
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 7 | 714 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |