MD SB690 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health, on or before January 1, 2021, to develop and publish materials to assist State residents with long-term care family planning; requiring certain materials to meet certain requirements, be consistent with certain other materials, and include certain contact information; requiring the Department to make certain materials available in certain languages; and requiring certain State agencies to update certain websites in a certain manner on or before January 1, 2021.
Title
Public Health - Long-Term Care Planning
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-15 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Electronic Communication
Forms
Health
Health, Department of
internet
Language
Long-Term Care
Public Health
Public Information
Publications
Records
Residency
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Electronic Communication
Forms
Health
Health, Department of
internet
Language
Long-Term Care
Public Health
Public Information
Publications
Records
Residency
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 20 | 2001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |