MD SB690 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission to study and make recommendations regarding the feasibility of the State providing certain Basic Health Program coverage in the State beginning January 1, 2020; requiring the study to address certain matters related to Basic Health Program coverage; requiring the Commission to include the findings of the study in its annual report to be submitted to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 31, 2018; etc.
Title
Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission – Basic Health Program – Study
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Ulysses Currie [D] | Sen. Delores Kelley [D] | Sen. Nathaniel Oaks [D] |
Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2018-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-02 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {707572/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
General Assembly
Health
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Health, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Public Health
Reports
General Assembly
Health
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Health, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Public Health
Reports