MD SB690 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a corporation to elect to be a specified benefit corporation by amending or including in the charter of the corporation a statement that the corporation is a benefit corporation; requiring the election to be approved by the stockholders in a specified manner; authorizing a corporation to terminate status as a benefit corporation in a specified manner; requiring that clear reference to the fact that a corporation is a benefit corporation appear prominently in a specified charter document; etc.
Title
Corporations - Benefit Corporation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (125-13) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-03-31 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-23 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2010-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | |
2010-03-25 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |