MD SB69 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Appraisal Management Company (AMC) Annual Federal Registry Fee Fund to hold the AMC fees collected from each registered appraisal management company; providing for the administration of the Fund; providing that the Fund is a special, nonlapsing fund that is not subject to certain provisions of law; requiring the State Treasurer to hold the Fund and the Comptroller to account for the Fund; providing for the transmittal of the fund; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appraisal Management Companies – Annual Fee and Reports

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 89
2019-04-02SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2019-03-27HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-27HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-26HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-18HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2019-01-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-01-15SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-01-15SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-01-14SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-01-03SenateHearing 1/10 at 1:30 p.m.
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-10-25SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback