MD SB69 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for an exception to a requirement that specified court documents be published in the Maryland Register if the court document is posted on the Web site of the Maryland Judiciary.
Title
Maryland Register - Publication of Court Documents - Exception
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-1) |
2014-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2014-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2014-01-24 | House | First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-11-08 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Electronic Government
Maryland Register
Public Information
State Documents
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Electronic Government
Maryland Register
Public Information
State Documents