MD SB688 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Maryland Department of Health from limiting eligibility to receive services under the Employed Persons with Disabilities Program based on the earned or unearned income of the applicant or the applicant's spouse, or any assets or resources of the applicant or the applicant's spouse.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Employed Persons with Disabilities Program – Eligibility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1157 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-16 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 15 | 138 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |