MD SB685 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB31
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, with a certain exception, a retail electricity or natural gas supplier from knowingly enrolling a certain residential customer with or submitting an enrollment to change the customer's electricity supplier to a competitive supplier if the customer had received certain financial assistance in the preceding 12 months; requiring an electric company to confirm certain matters in its records at a certain time; requiring an electric company to verify a customer's status at a certain time; etc.
Title
Electricity and Gas - Energy Suppliers - Assisted Customers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (36-9) |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {327672/1 Adopted |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB685 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Referred Economic Matters
HB1224 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-11 - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1224 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-11 - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Energy
Energy Matters
Fuel
Human Services, Department of
Poverty
Prices
Public Service Commission
Residential Property
State Aid
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Energy
Energy Matters
Fuel
Human Services, Department of
Poverty
Prices
Public Service Commission
Residential Property
State Aid
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 604.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |