MD SB685 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 190
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 190
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Human Resources or a local department of social services to provide to a health care practitioner specified information if requested by the health care practitioner or a specified agency, institution, or program under specified circumstances; requiring the Department to work with relevant stakeholders and report the outcome of the work to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2014; etc;
Title
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Provision of Information to Health Care Practitioners
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-1) (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 190 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-1) |
2014-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2014-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-26 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2014-03-20 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {968779/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Child Abuse and Neglect
Children
Disclosure
Family Law
Health
Health Occupations
Human Resources, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Mental Health
Minors
Notices
Physicians
Privacy
Records
Reports
Social Services
Child Abuse and Neglect
Children
Disclosure
Family Law
Health
Health Occupations
Human Resources, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Mental Health
Minors
Notices
Physicians
Privacy
Records
Reports
Social Services