MD SB685 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-29 - of the Maryland Constitution
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-29 - of the Maryland Constitution
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing messenger service drivers whose work is not covered employment to deliver specified items and use specified methods of delivery; expanding the requirements that the Secretary of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation must find to be satisfied for specified work performed by a specified messenger service driver to not be covered employment; etc.
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Messenger Service Drivers - Delivery
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Jim Mathias [D] | Sen. Anthony Muse [D] |
Sen. E.J. Pipkin [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-29 | of the Maryland Constitution | |
2011-05-29 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (135-1) | |
2011-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-04-07 | Re-referred Economic Matters | |
2011-03-31 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2011-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2011-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-31 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2011-02-08 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Federal Government
Insurance
Transportation
Unemployment
Work, Labor and Employment
Federal Government
Insurance
Transportation
Unemployment
Work, Labor and Employment