MD SB684 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an affiliate of an electric company from using the electric company's trade name, logo, billing services, mail inserts, advertising, or computer services for a plan or program that provides heating, ventilation, air conditioning, or refrigeration services; requiring the Public Service Commission to determine just and reasonable compensation that an affiliate of an electric company shall provide to customers of the electric company's regulated services; etc.
Title
Energy Efficiency Programs - Heating, Ventilation, Air Conditioning, and Refrigeration Services
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-17 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Advertising
Assessments
Contracts
Copyright
Energy Matters
Heating and Cooling
Notices
Public Service Commission
Rules and Regulations
Utility Regulation
Assessments
Contracts
Copyright
Energy Matters
Heating and Cooling
Notices
Public Service Commission
Rules and Regulations
Utility Regulation