MD SB681 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Transportation to establish a process for performing major highway capacity expansion project impact assessments; requiring the Department and a metropolitan planning organization to perform an impact assessment under certain circumstances; requiring the Department to use the impact assessment to determine whether a project meets certain requirements; requiring the Department and a metropolitan planning organization to develop a certain mitigation plan under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Major Highway Capacity Expansion Projects - Impact Assessments and Mitigation Plans (Transportation and Climate Alignment Act of 2024)
Sponsors
Sen. Clarence Lam [D] | Sen. Dawn Gile [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2024-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB836 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator King) Adopted
Subjects
Air Pollution
Artificial Intelligence
Bicycles
Buses
Construction
Electronic Government
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Justice
Environmental Matters
Highways
internet
Internet Access
Low-Income
Mass Transit
Minorities
Parking
Pedestrians
Railroads
Ridesharing and Carsharing
Rules and Regulations
studies
Telecommunications and Information Technology
telework
Traffic Regulation
Transportation - Highways
Transportation, Department of
Zoning and Planning
Artificial Intelligence
Bicycles
Buses
Construction
Electronic Government
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Justice
Environmental Matters
Highways
internet
Internet Access
Low-Income
Mass Transit
Minorities
Parking
Pedestrians
Railroads
Ridesharing and Carsharing
Rules and Regulations
studies
Telecommunications and Information Technology
telework
Traffic Regulation
Transportation - Highways
Transportation, Department of
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 1 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 2 | 103.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 2 | 901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 2 | 902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 2 | 903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 2 | 904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 2 | 905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 2 | 906 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 2 | 907 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |