MD SB680 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the date from November 15 to November 1 by which a member of the General Assembly may request the Department of Legislative Services to prepare a bill for prefile at a regular session under certain circumstances; and altering the date from the second Friday after Thanksgiving to the preceding November 20 by which a member may direct the Department to prefile a bill under certain circumstances.
Title
General Assembly - Prefiled Bills - Deadlines
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. William Ferguson [D] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] | Sen. Barbara Robinson [D] |
Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-2) (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-0) (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-0) (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-2) |
2018-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 11:30 a.m. |
2018-02-26 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-0) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Legislation
Legislative Services, Department of
Public Officials
State Government - General Assembly
Time
Legislative Services, Department of
Public Officials
State Government - General Assembly
Time