MD SB680 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing, from 30 days to 60 days, the period of time during which a local department of social services must complete an investigation of a report of abuse, neglect, self-neglect, or financial exploitation when the report does not indicate that an emergency exists.
Title
Adult Protective Services Investigations - Completion Time
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2017-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-17 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |