MD SB68 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB958
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring membership in the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System for certain local law enforcement officers of the Crisfield Police Department under certain circumstances; providing that a certain individual is entitled to eligibility service and creditable service that was earned before the effective date of the Crisfield Police Department's participation in the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System; providing for the transfer of creditable service for a certain individual; etc.
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Crisfield Police Department
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2023-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 9:30 a.m. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB958 (Carry Over) 2022-04-08 - Hearing 4/08 at 1:45 p.m.
HB163 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72
HB163 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 31 | 2A-05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 31 | 2A-06 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |