MD SB68 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that the Department of Natural Resources establish a program in Charles County and St. Mary's County to train rifle shooters to hunt deer for the purpose of controlling the deer population; authorizing an individual who holds a specified permit to use a specified rifle in specified locations and under specified conditions in Charles County and St. Mary's County; altering the circumstances and conditions under which an individual may hunt deer on State land in Charles County and St. Mary's County; etc.
Title
Charles County and St. Mary's County - Deer Management Permit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-3) (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2015-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-3) |
2015-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {380212/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-17 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {824738/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Animals
Blue Laws
Charles County
Emergency Bills
Farmland
Guns
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Leases and Rent
Licenses
Reports
Rules and Regulations
St. Mary's County
Sunset
Weapons
Blue Laws
Charles County
Emergency Bills
Farmland
Guns
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Leases and Rent
Licenses
Reports
Rules and Regulations
St. Mary's County
Sunset
Weapons