MD SB677 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-27 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-27 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Statewide Secure Schools Emergency Response Program within the Maryland Center for School Safety; prohibiting the inspection of certain records related to the Program; requiring the Maryland 9-1-1 Board to establish procedures to integrate county 9-1-1 systems with the Program; and requiring the Governor to provide $4,500,000 in the annual budget bill for fiscal year 2024 for the Program and $1,000,000 for fiscal year 2025 and each fiscal year thereafter.
Title
Maryland Center for School Safety – Statewide Secure Schools Emergency Response Program – Established
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Subjects
Appropriations
Certifications
Communications
Education - Miscellaneous
Emergencies
Emergency Management, Department of
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement
Mobile Devices
Public Safety
Public Schools
Records
Rescue Squads
Safety
Certifications
Communications
Education - Miscellaneous
Emergencies
Emergency Management, Department of
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement
Mobile Devices
Public Safety
Public Schools
Records
Rescue Squads
Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 7 | 1502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 1513 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 4 | 314.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 1 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 1 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 1 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0677?ys=2023RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/sb/sb0677f.pdf |