MD SB676 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-26 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-26 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Garrett County Virtual Education Days Pilot Program; authorizing the Garrett County Superintendent to order a virtual education day instead of closing a public school in the event of inclement weather; requiring the county superintendent to notify a public school principal as soon as possible after making a certain decision; requiring the Garrett County Board of Education to submit a report on its use of virtual education days to certain committees of the General Assembly by September 1, 2023; etc.
Title
Garrett County - Public Schools - Virtual Education Days Pilot Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Floor Amendment {524030/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {304434/1 Adopted |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {304434/1 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB1128 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-08 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
County Administrators
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Emergencies
Food
Garrett County
internet
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Public Schools
Remote and Hybrid Education
School Administration
Students
Weather
Work, Labor, and Employment
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Emergencies
Food
Garrett County
internet
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Public Schools
Remote and Hybrid Education
School Administration
Students
Weather
Work, Labor, and Employment