MD SB676 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the limitation on the number of community benefits district management authorities that the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore may establish.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore City - Community Benefits Districts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 226
2018-04-09SenateReturned Passed
2018-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (138-1)
2018-04-09HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-09HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-06HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-03-20HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-27HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-02HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2018-03-01SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-02-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-02-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-02-26SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-22SenateHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-01SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback