MD SB676 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 540
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 540
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the prohibition on the neglect or refusal, by an adult child who has or is able to earn sufficient means, to provide a destitute parent with food, shelter, care, and clothing; altering the definition of "responsible relative", as it relates to responsibility for the cost of specified services provided in a facility or program operated or funded by the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, to exclude from the definition the children of a recipient of specified services; etc.
Title
Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (124-13) (Y: 124 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 540 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (124-13) |
2017-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-10 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-10 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-04-08 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2017-04-06 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-1) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {718377/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Bonds
Courts
Family Law
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Liability
Negligence
Public Health
State's Attorneys
Support of Dependents
Vulnerable Adults
Courts
Family Law
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Liability
Negligence
Public Health
State's Attorneys
Support of Dependents
Vulnerable Adults