MD SB672 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 823
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 823
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from $114,500 to $124,500 the maximum salary of a register of wills; and providing for the application of the Act.
Title
Register of Wills - Salary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (103-35) (Y: 104 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-2) (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-2) (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-26 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 823 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (103-35) |
2018-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-04-06 | House | Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-26 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-2) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |