MD SB670 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-19 - First Reading Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-19 - First Reading Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reestablishing the Task Force on Solar Hot Water Systems in Prince George's County; providing for the members of the Task Force; providing for the designation of a chair of the Task Force; requiring the Prince George's County government to provide staff for the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving compensation; requiring the Task Force to undertake specified activities relating to the use of solar hot water systems in Prince George's County; etc.
Title
Task Force on Solar Hot Water Systems in Prince George's County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-19 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2011-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-16 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2011-02-18 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-18 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-02-11 | Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-10 | Re-assigned Finance | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Alternative Energy Sources
Committees and Commissions
Energy Matters
Heating and Cooling
Prince George's County
Reports
Sunset
Water
Alternative Energy Sources
Committees and Commissions
Energy Matters
Heating and Cooling
Prince George's County
Reports
Sunset
Water