MD SB67 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 179
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 179
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a veterinary practitioner from performing certain declawing procedures on a cat unless the procedure is necessary for a therapeutic purpose; authorizing the State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners to impose certain disciplinary actions on a veterinary practitioner for willful violations of the prohibition; providing that a violation of the Act is a civil offense; and providing that a person who violates the Act is subject to a fine of up to $1,000.
Title
Animal Welfare - Declawing Cats - Prohibited Acts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 102 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Floor Amendment 843821/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (Y: 18 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Floor Amendment 843821/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (Y: 18 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 179 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (102-24) |
2022-04-01 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-14) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Floor Amendment {843821/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (18-29) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {253825/1 Adopted |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {253825/1 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-10-05 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB22 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Subjects
Agriculture
Animals
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Discipline
Fines
Law Enforcement
Licenses
Veterinarians
Animals
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Discipline
Fines
Law Enforcement
Licenses
Veterinarians
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Agriculture | 2 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 2 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 2 | 310.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 2 | 313.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 10 | 625.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |