MD SB67 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 799
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a paramedic to administer certain immunizations and skin testing to certain ambulance service personnel under certain circumstances; authorizing a paramedic to administer influenza and 2019CoV immunizations if the immunizations are under the direction of a certain physician and authorized by the Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems, part of a certain outreach effort, and provided in accordance with a certain written agreement; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Medical Services – Paramedics – Vaccination Administration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 799
2021-04-12SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-12SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2021-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (131-5)
2021-04-09HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-09HouseFavorable with Amendments {766381/1 Adopted
2021-04-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2021-03-20HouseHearing canceled
2021-03-17HouseHearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-02HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2021-01-29SenateThird Reading Passed (44-1)
2021-01-26SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-01-26SenateFavorable with Amendments {913920/1 Adopted
2021-01-26SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-12-29SenateHearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-09-23SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB1313 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-11 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education13516(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0067?ys=2021RS
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0067f.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0067t.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0067e.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/Chapters_noln/CH_799_sb0067e.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0067_91392001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0067_76638101.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0067_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0067_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0101.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1303.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/1247.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback