MD SB67 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Classifying the offense of home invasion as a crime of violence under specified provisions of law.
Title
Crime of Violence - Home Invasion
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) |
2015-04-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {142910/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2015-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-20 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |