MD SB668 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Environment and Transportation
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Environment and Transportation
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration, in cooperation with certain stakeholders, to develop and implement a Purple Line marketing plan designed to generate early interest in and promote use of the Purple Line; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill $500,000 from the Transportation Trust Fund for the marketing plan in fiscal year 2021; requiring the Administration, by December 31, 2021, to submit a certain report to certain standing committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Purple Line Marketing Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] | Sen. Malcolm Augustine [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] |
Sen. William Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-5) |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {397274/1 Adopted |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB876 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Advertising
Appropriations
Bicycles
Budgets
Buses
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Commuters
Construction
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Examinations
Governor
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Mass Transit
Montgomery County
Pedestrians
Prices
Prince George's County
Public Information
Public Officials
Railroads
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Zoning and Planning
Advertising
Appropriations
Bicycles
Budgets
Buses
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Commuters
Construction
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Examinations
Governor
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Mass Transit
Montgomery County
Pedestrians
Prices
Prince George's County
Public Information
Public Officials
Railroads
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 7 | 712 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |