MD SB666 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain maximum amounts of monetary relief the Maryland Commission on Civil Rights is authorized to award if the Commission finds that a respondent has engaged in a discriminatory act under provisions of law regarding public accommodations and persons licensed or regulated by the Maryland Department of Labor; requiring, by July 1, 2025, and by each July 1 for the next 4 years, the Commission to submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly on the impact of the Act on persons against whom complaints have been filed; etc.
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Monetary Relief
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (41-4) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2024-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (101-38) |
2024-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments {923723/1 Adopted |
2024-03-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-03-25 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-15 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {733421/1 Adopted |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB368 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-26 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Accessibility - see also- Blind; Deaf; DevDisPer; PhysDisPer
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Civil Rights and Social Equity
Commerce and Business
Commission on Civil Rights
complaints
Court Orders
Damages
Discrimination
Goods and Services
Hotels and Motels
Human Relations
Investigations and Inquiries
Judges
Licenses
Mass Transit
Repeat Offenders
Reports
Restaurants
Stadiums
Statutes of Limitation
Theaters
Work, Labor, and Employment
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Civil Rights and Social Equity
Commerce and Business
Commission on Civil Rights
complaints
Court Orders
Damages
Discrimination
Goods and Services
Hotels and Motels
Human Relations
Investigations and Inquiries
Judges
Licenses
Mass Transit
Repeat Offenders
Reports
Restaurants
Stadiums
Statutes of Limitation
Theaters
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 20 | 1016 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 20 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 20 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |