MD SB666 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Carroll County or of a municipal corporation in Carroll County to grant, by law, a tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on specified housing units at independent living retirement communities; etc.
Title
Carroll County - Property Tax Credit for Housing Units at Independent Living
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (122-2) | |
2012-04-01 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-04-01 | Favorable with Amendments 885668/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-03-26 | Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-18 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2012-04-03 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-04-03 | Senate Concur - House Amendment | |
2012-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-16 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments 119830/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2012-03-07 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:30 p.m. | |
2012-03-07 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |