MD SB665 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating, beginning in calendar year 2015, the last 7 days of August through the first 7 days of September of each year to be tax-free periods during which an exemption from the sales and use tax is provided for the sale of specified textbooks purchased by specified individuals; designating in calendar year 2016 an additional tax-free period during the last 14 days of January for return-to-school shopping in Maryland; and defining a specified term.
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Community Colleges
Exemptions
Higher Education
Sales and Use Tax
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Taxes - Sales and Use
Textbooks
Exemptions
Higher Education
Sales and Use Tax
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Taxes - Sales and Use
Textbooks