MD SB663 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1386
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a rebuttable presumption in certain child custody proceedings that joint legal custody and joint physical custody for approximately equal periods of time are in the best interests of a child and establishing factors a court may consider when determining the best interests of the child; authorizing the court to award sole custody based on a preponderance of the evidence that a joint custody arrangement is not in the best interests of the child; requiring the Court to enter certain factors on the record; etc.
Title
Child Custody - Rebuttable Presumption of Joint Custody
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB1386 (Carry Over) 2016-03-09 - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Boundaries
Child Custody
Courts
Family Law
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Time
Visitation Rights
Work, Labor, and Employment
Child Custody
Courts
Family Law
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Time
Visitation Rights
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Family Law | 9 | 109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0663?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/sb/sb0663f.pdf |