MD SB661 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-17 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-17 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Comptroller to provide a certain grant payment to an individual paid certain unemployment insurance benefits after December 31, 2021, but before January 1, 2023, under certain circumstances; and allowing a subtraction under the Maryland income tax for the amounts of grants paid in accordance with the Act.
Title
Unemployment Insurance – Tax Parity for Delayed Payments of Benefits
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-17 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {223021/1 Adopted |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB708 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-17 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Comptroller
Grants
Income Tax
Insurance
Labor, Department of
Taxes - Income
Unemployment
Unemployment Insurance
Grants
Income Tax
Insurance
Labor, Department of
Taxes - Income
Unemployment
Unemployment Insurance
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |