MD SB660 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to establish a demonstration program supported by State general funds to cover health care services provided to certain individuals that are not covered by the Maryland Medical Assistance Program; authorizing the Department to establish eligibility criteria for and a cap on enrollment in the demonstration program; requiring the Department, by December 1, 2020, to submit to the Governor and certain committees of the General Assembly a certain report on the demonstration program; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Department of Health – Enrollees in the Employed Individuals With Disabilities Program – Demonstration Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-3) (Y: 138 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 447
2018-04-09SenateReturned Passed
2018-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (137-3)
2018-04-07HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-07HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-07HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-04-06HouseHearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-04-04HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2018-03-30HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2018-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments {487476/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-03-07SenateHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-01SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback