MD SB66 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Office of Statewide Broadband in the Department of Housing and Community Development to ensure that every resident of the State is supported by high-quality, affordable broadband Internet service and has the tools necessary to take advantage of the Internet; requiring the Office to develop, by July 1, 2022, a statewide plan to ensure that all State residents have the ability to connect to reliable broadband Internet by December 31, 2026; establishing the Digital Inclusion Fund to support capacity building in the State; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Statewide Broadband - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 120 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 74
2021-04-09SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-09SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2021-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (120-17)
2021-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {183293/1 Adopted
2021-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2021-03-19HouseReferred Economic Matters
2021-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments {574437/1 Adopted
2021-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-01-22SenateHearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
2020-09-23SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB97 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Economic Development13501(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development13502(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development13503(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development13504(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development13505(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development13506(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development51101(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development51102(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development6107(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development6.5101(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development6.5102(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development6.5103(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development6.5104(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development6.5105(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development6.5106(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development6.5107(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement6226(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0066?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0066f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0066t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0066e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/Chapters_noln/CH_74_sb0066e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0066_57443701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0066_18329301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0066_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0066_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0518.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1153.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/1071.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback