MD SB66 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting professional corporations in which a majority of the stockholders are individuals who are licensed, certified, or otherwise authorized to practice a health occupation under the Health Occupations Article from the requirement that the name of a professional corporation must be approved by the appropriate licensing unit and professional organization; providing that the exemption does not apply to a professional corporation that provides dental services; etc.
Title
Professional Corporations - Approval of Corporate Name by Licensing Unit and Professional Organization - Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendment |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0) |
2016-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {803893/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-26 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {208574/1 Report Adopted |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-09-21 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Corporations
Corporations and Associations
Dentists
Foreign Trade
Health Occupations
Licenses
Names
Physicians
Corporations and Associations
Dentists
Foreign Trade
Health Occupations
Licenses
Names
Physicians