MD SB659 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Task Force on Practices and Procedures on Solitary Confinement; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study specified issues related to solitary confinement in the correctional system of the State and report its recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly by December 1, 2017; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Task Force on Practices and Procedures on Solitary Confinement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-06SenateUnfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2017-02-21SenateHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-03SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback