MD SB658 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Legal Services Corporation, in consultation with Civil Justice, Inc., to establish the End-of-Life Legal Services Pilot Program to provide low- and moderate-income seniors with the preparation of legal documents, legal assistance in civil proceedings, and other matters; specifying eligibility requirements for participation in the Program; requiring the Program to establish a certain intake method, establish a certain outreach method, and provide for the services of at least one full-time attorney; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Legal Services Corporation - End-of-Life Legal Services Pilot Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateUnfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
2019-02-27SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback