MD SB658 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-07 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-07 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the owner of a retail business with an automated teller machine located on the premises of the business who has knowledge of an illegal skimming device installed on or near the automated teller machine to immediately notify the operator of the automated teller machine of the existence of the skimming device and specified identifying information about the automated teller machine to assist the operator in identifying the affected automated teller machine.
Title
Retail Business Owners - Automated Teller Machines - Notice of Skimming Device
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {387576/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Consumer Protection
Equipment
Financial Institutions
Fraud
Identification
Notices
Retail Sales
Commerce and Business
Consumer Protection
Equipment
Financial Institutions
Fraud
Identification
Notices
Retail Sales