MD SB658 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount not to exceed $150,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the School Board of Prince George's County for the renovation of the Friendly High School Gymnasium, located in Fort Washington; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; establishing a deadline for the encumbrance or expenditure of the loan proceeds; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Friendly High School
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation Withdrawn | |
2012-03-07 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-29 | Hearing 3/10 at 10:00 a.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/SB0658.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/sb/sb0658f.pdf |