MD SB658 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified persons to register as appraisal management companies with the State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers and Home Inspectors; requiring an appraisal management company's registration to include specified information in a specified form; establishing that a registration is valid for a specified period of time; requiring the Commission to collect a specified national registry fee from appraisal management companies; etc.
Title
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers and Home Inspectors - Special Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Barry Glassman [R] | Sen. Delores Kelley [D] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Thomas Miller [D] |
Sen. Anthony Muse [D] | Sen. Catherine Pugh [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 115 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (115-20) | |
2011-04-04 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-03-27 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2011-04-06 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2011-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-25 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Advertising
Appraisals
Auditors and Audits
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Consumer Protection
Contractors
Discipline
Disclosure
Electronic Commerce
Fees
Hearings
Housing
Inspections
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Licenses
Mortgages
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Process Serving
Publications
Real Estate
Real Property
Records
Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries
Signatures
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Appraisals
Auditors and Audits
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Consumer Protection
Contractors
Discipline
Disclosure
Electronic Commerce
Fees
Hearings
Housing
Inspections
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Licenses
Mortgages
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Process Serving
Publications
Real Estate
Real Property
Records
Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries
Signatures
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment