MD SB658 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County or of a municipal corporation in Anne Arundel County to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the county or municipal tax imposed on specified real property that is owned by Arundel Habitat for Humanity, Inc.; authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County or of a municipal corporation in Anne Arundel County to provide, by law, for the provisions of the credit; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2010; etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Arundel Habitat for Humanity, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-03-31 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-1) | |
2010-03-30 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-30 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-19 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2010-04-04 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-04-04 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2010-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-02-15 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-05 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Housing
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Property Tax
Real Property
Tax Credits
Housing
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Property Tax
Real Property
Tax Credits